Duffy, Clyde (F. Clyde), 1890-1977
Name Entries
person
Duffy, Clyde (F. Clyde), 1890-1977
Name Components
Name :
Duffy, Clyde (F. Clyde), 1890-1977
Genders
Male
Exist Dates
Biographical History
F. Clyde Duffy was born on March 20, 1890, in Devils Lake, North Dakota. He was the son of Maurice and Margaret (Flood) Duffy. He graduated from Devils Lake High School, before entering the University of North Dakota. While at UND, Duffy was active in the A.D.T. Literary Society, the University Catholic Association, the Varsity Bachelor Club, the Bruce Law Club, and the Debating Board of Control. He also represented the University at two international debates with the University of Manitoba in 1910 and 1911. He graduated from UND with a Bachelor of Laws degree on June 12, 1912. Duffy acted as city editor of the Grand Forks Herald in 1913, before opening a law firm with Torger Sinness in Minnewaukan, North Dakota. He married Exzelia Beauchamp in Fargo on September 11, 1915. The couple had two daughters: Margaret and Patricia. Sinness and Duffy moved their law firm to Devils Lake in 1925. He served as an Special Assistant Attorney General from 1925-1930, and was appointed by North Dakota Governor John Moses in 1939 to investigate irregularities at the State Hospital for the Insane, the Motor Vehicle Registration Department, and the State Mill and Elevator. Duffy also acted as Code Commissioner from 1939-1944, and as the City Attorney for Devils Lake for many years. Duffy was an active member of the Republican party, and served as precinct committee, chair of the Ramsey County Republican Committee, and member of the state Republican Central Committee. He was also a representative to the 1936 Republican National Convention in Cleveland. He was elected to the North Dakota Senate in 1948, serving until 1956. He acted as minority floor leader in 1953 and 1955, before being elected as Lieutenant Governor in 1956. In 1958, he unsuccessfully sought the Republican nomination for United States Senator versus the incumbent William Langer. Duffy was the Director of the Otter Tail Power Company, the Ramsey National Bank, and the Northern National Insurance Company. He served as President of the North Dakota Bar Association, in addition to being active with the Kiwanis, the Knights of Colombus, and the Devils Lake Chamber of Commerce. Duffy retired in 1970, and died on December 17, 1977, in Santa Clara, California. He is buried at St. Joseph Catholic Cemetery in Devils Lake.
eng
Latn
External Related CPF
https://viaf.org/viaf/173579129
https://www.worldcat.org/identities/lccn-no2011115739
https://id.loc.gov/authorities/no2011115739
Other Entity IDs (Same As)
Sources
Loading ...
Resource Relations
Loading ...
Internal CPF Relations
Loading ...
Languages Used
eng
Zyyy
Subjects
Lawyers
Legislators
Lieutenant governors
Newspaper editors
Nationalities
Americans
Activities
Occupations
Legal Statuses
Places
Devils Lake (N.D.)
AssociatedPlace
North Dakota
AssociatedPlace
Convention Declarations
<conventionDeclaration><citation>VIAF</citation></conventionDeclaration>